MA H2016 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2015
Note: Legislation replaced by H56
Note: Legislation replaced by H56
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to House Rules governing the 2015-2016 legislative sessions, as amended and adopted by the House. January 29, 2015.
Title
House Rules governing the 2015-2016 legislative sessions
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | Order adopted, see H56 |
2015-01-29 | House | Placed on file |
2015-01-29 | House | H2015, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H2015 (Replaces) 2015-01-29 - Published as amended, see H2016
H56 (Replaced by) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H2016
S8 (Similar To) -
H54 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H4727 (Similar To) 2016-11-14 - Senate concurred
S28 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
H3333 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2015
S50 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - Passed to be engrossed
H3593 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Placed on file
H56 (Replaced by) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H2016
S8 (Similar To) -
H54 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H4727 (Similar To) 2016-11-14 - Senate concurred
S28 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
H3333 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2015
S50 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - Passed to be engrossed
H3593 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Placed on file
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2016 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2016.pdf |