MA S2451 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-03 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2012 from 03:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-03 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2012 from 03:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Greenfield to grant an additional license for the sale of wine and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Greenfield to grant an additional license for the sale of wine and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2012 from 03:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2012-11-19 | House | House concurred |
2012-11-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2451 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119875&generalCourtId=1 |