MA S245 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2383

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to reimbursement for transportation costs for homeless students. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to homeless children school transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2383
2017-05-09JointHearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S213 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S286 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S322 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
H244 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437
H2857 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4132
S2383 (Replaced by) 2018-04-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback