MA S2436 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to amend the Nantucket Sewer Act. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the Nantucket Sewer Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-18SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-12-26SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2023-10-09JointHearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2023-08-14HouseHouse concurred
2023-08-10SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H4077 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Amendment #1 (Walsh) adopted
H4116 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4449 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4645 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4646 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback