MA S2427 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S266
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to income eligible childcare, reports the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2427).
Title
Order relative to authorizing the joint committee on Education to make an investigation and study of a certain current Senate document relative to early education
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Accompanied by S266 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S266 (Replaces) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2427
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H332 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H977 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S2528 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Placed on file
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H332 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H977 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S2528 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Placed on file
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2427 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2427.pdf |