MA S240 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Accompanied S221
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Accompanied S221
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure high quality pre-kindergarten education. Education.
Title
Ensuring high quality pre-kindergarten education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Accompanied S221 |
2017-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S221 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S193 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S255 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H320 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied H2874
H2838 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied H2874
H2874 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4665
H4665 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S193 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S255 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H320 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied H2874
H2838 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Accompanied H2874
H2874 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4665
H4665 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S240 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S240.pdf |