MA H2838 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Accompanied H2874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Accompanied H2874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the universal pre-kindergarten commission. Education.
Title
To expand universal pre-kindergarten
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Accompanied H2874 |
2017-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1182 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
S2149 (Similar To) -
H2874 (Replaced by) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4665
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
S2616 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2658 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 316 of the Acts of 2018
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1182 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
S2149 (Similar To) -
H2874 (Replaced by) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4665
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
S2616 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2658 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 316 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2838 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2838.pdf |