MA S2388 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2658
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2658
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2658
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide a sustainable future for rural schools. Education.
Title
To provide a sustainable future for rural schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2658 |
2023-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-05-18 | House | House concurred |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2658 (Replaced by) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4425 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3567 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4425
H4425 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3567 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4425
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2388 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2388.pdf |