MA S2387 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2299
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to license plates in the Commonwealth (Senate, No. 2387).
Title
Relative to license plates in the commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment with a further amendment |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-08-09 | House | Amendment adopted |
2012-08-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2012-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-31 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2012-07-31 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2012-07-31 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of an amendment, H4369 |
2012-07-30 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Substituted for S2299 |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-27 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S2299 |
2012-07-27 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2299 (Replaces) 2012-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2387
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2387 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119622&generalCourtId=1 |