MA S2299 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1798
Note: Legislation replaced by S2387
Note: Legislation replaced by S2387
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To enhance the license plate system of the Commonwealth
Title
To enhance the license plate system of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-30 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2387 |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Read second |
2012-07-27 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Monday, July 30, 2012 |
2012-07-27 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules |
2012-07-27 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2387 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate committee on Ways and Means |
2012-06-12 | Senate | New draft of S1798 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1798 (Replaces) 2012-06-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2299
S2387 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
S2387 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2299 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=118793&generalCourtId=1 |