MA S2384 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislationfor legislation relative to school safety on election day, reports the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2384).
Title
Order relative to authorizing the joint committee on Education to make an investigation and study of certain current Senate documents relative to safety
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Accompanied by S312, S315 and S327 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S312 (Replaces) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
S315 (Replaces) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
S327 (Replaces) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2258 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H332 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H977 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S2528 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Placed on file
H4815 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 202 of the Acts of 2018
S315 (Replaces) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
S327 (Replaces) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2258 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2256 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H332 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H977 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S2528 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Placed on file
H4815 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 202 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2384 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2384.pdf |