MA S2374 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3469
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-12 - Accompanied H3469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-12 - Accompanied H3469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain bridge in the town of Needham the private first class David “Damon” Borrelli memorial bridge. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain bridge in the town of Needham the private first class David “Damon” Borrelli memorial bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | House | Accompanied H3469 |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3469 (Replaced by) 2021-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2374 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2374.pdf |