MA S2357 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to recognition of the "Honor and Remember" flag in the Commonwealth. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to recognition of the "Honor and Remember" flag in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. John Velis [D] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2023 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H3498 (Similar To) 2024-05-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2357 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2357.pdf |