MA S2350 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4285
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - See H4285
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - See H4285
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to housing, operations, military service, and enrichment (House, No. 4285) (being the text of Senate document numbered 2325, printed as amended).
Title
Relative to housing, operations, military service, and enrichment
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | See H4285 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Text of S2325, printed as amended |
Same As/Similar To
H4285 (Replaced by) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 141 of the Acts of 2016
S2325 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - See H4285
S1721 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1742 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H3187 (Similar To) 2015-04-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2015
H3196 (Similar To) 2016-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2016
H1095 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
S2325 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - See H4285
S1721 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1742 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H3187 (Similar To) 2015-04-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2015
H3196 (Similar To) 2016-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2016
H1095 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2350 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2350.pdf |