MA S2344 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2712
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2712
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2712
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to motor vehicle leasing parity. Transportation.
Title
Relative to motor vehicle leasing parity
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2712 |
2021-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3460 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2925 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3555 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2712 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3487 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2541 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5320
S2349 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3429 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4263
H2925 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3555 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2712 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3487 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2541 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5320
S2349 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3429 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4263
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2344 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2344.pdf |