MA S2333 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2651
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Lewis (by request), a petition of Vincent Lawrence Dixon for the adoption of resolutions to memorialize the Massachusetts Delegation, and the United States Congress, on the need for general support of NATO, and public education regarding this subject matter. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Resolutions memorializing the Massachusetts Delegation, and the United States Congress, on the need for general support of NATO, and public education regarding this subject matter
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2651 |
2024-01-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H3262 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H1631 (Similar To) 2023-10-24 - Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2651 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1631 (Similar To) 2023-10-24 - Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2651 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2333 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2333.pdf |