MA S2331 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H312
Note: Legislation replaced by S2501
Note: Legislation replaced by S2501
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-20 - New draft substituted, see S2501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-20 - New draft substituted, see S2501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to vocational education transportation for nonresident students and of Donald R. Berthiaume, Jr., and others relative to out-of-district vocational school transportation,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2331).
Title
Relative to vocational education transportation for nonresident students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-20 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2501 |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Read second |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2501 |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-06-13 | Senate | New draft of H312 and S288 |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H312 (Replaces) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2331
S2501 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
H3683 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1975 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1976 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2047
H3754 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S2013 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Reported (in part) by S2048
S2501 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
H3683 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1975 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1976 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2047
H3754 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S2013 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Reported (in part) by S2048
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2331 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2331.pdf |