MA S2246 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S104
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing consumers with equal protection for all real estate appraisals
Title
Providing consumers with equal protection for all real estate appraisals
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-01-22 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Substituted for S104 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S104 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S104 (Replaces) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2246
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2246 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2246.pdf |