MA S2228 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-04 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-04 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative the question of the conduct of Senator Stanley C. Rosenberg.
Title
Relative the question of the conduct of President Stanley C. Rosenberg
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Order adopted Roll Call #316 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-04 | Senate | Placed on file |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Order adopted -see Roll Call #316 (Yeas 37 - Nays 0) |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Rules suspended |
Same As/Similar To
H364 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2059 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H949 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S818 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S909 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S6 (Similar To) 2017-01-04 - Adopted
H2059 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H949 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S818 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S909 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S6 (Similar To) 2017-01-04 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2228 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2228.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/190/SenateRollCall316.pdf |