MA S2217 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2569
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on November 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - New draft substituted, see S2569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - New draft substituted, see S2569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to promoting construction zone safety
Title
Promoting construction zone safety
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2569 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, June 28, 2018 |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2569 |
2017-12-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/06/17 from 1:00PM-3:00PM in A-1 |
2017-11-27 | House | House concurred |
2017-11-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1210 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1211 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1880 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H399 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H984 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2569 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2614 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2018
H4913 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5005 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 339 of the Acts of 2018
H4113 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1210 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1211 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1880 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H399 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H984 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2569 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2614 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2018
H4913 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5005 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 339 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2217 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2217.pdf |