MA S2214 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2178
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-14 - See S2178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-14 - See S2178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-14 | Senate | See S2178 |
Same As/Similar To
S2178 (Replaced by) 2017-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2017
S2099 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - New draft substituted, see S2168
S2168 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Reprinted as amended, see S2178
S1913 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
H1798 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S2099 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - New draft substituted, see S2168
S2168 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Reprinted as amended, see S2178
S1913 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
H1798 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2214 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2214.pdf |