MA S2194 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2617
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2617
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2617
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a program to increase cultural equity in tourism promotion and marketing. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Establishing a program to increase cultural equity in tourism promotion and marketing
Sponsors
Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D] | Rep. Patricia Duffy [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2617 |
2023-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2617 (Replaced by) 2024-02-12 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4286 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4637 (Similar To) 2024-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4996
H4803 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Pending new draft of H2333
H4286 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4637 (Similar To) 2024-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4996
H4803 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Pending new draft of H2333
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2194 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2194.pdf |