MA H4803 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2333
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Pending new draft of H2333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Pending new draft of H2333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish the Massachusetts incarcerated individual bone marrow and organ donation program
Title
To establish the Massachusetts incarcerated individual bone marrow and organ donation program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | House | Pending new draft of H2333 |
2024-06-27 | House | Reported from the committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H2333 (Replaces) 2024-06-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
H2314 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2675 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2372 (Similar To) 2024-05-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2883 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2314 (Similar To) 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2675 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2372 (Similar To) 2024-05-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S2883 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4803 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4803.pdf |