MA S2154 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-16 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide that future members of the police department of the town of Adams shall be exempt from the provisions of the Commonwealth's civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing that future members of the police department of the town of Adams shall be exempt from the provisions of the Commonwealth's civil service law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-16HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-11-15SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2017-11-15SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2017-10-19SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-10-10SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2017-09-13JointHearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222
2017-08-17HouseHouse concurred
2017-08-14SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H3727 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2017
S678 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:30 PM in A-2
H2235 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:30 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback