MA S2666 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to exempt all positions in the police department of the city of North Adams from the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting all positions in the police department of the city of North Adams from the civil service law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-13HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-12-13HouseRules suspended
2018-12-13HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-12-10HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-12-06SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-12-06SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-11-13SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2018-11-13SenateBill reported favorably by committee
2018-10-25JointHearing scheduled for 10/30/2018 from 10:00 AM-11:00 AM in A-1
2018-10-09HouseHouse concurred
2018-10-04SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H1410 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2086 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3864 (Similar To) 2017-12-26 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3883 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4704 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback