MA S2146 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the Brookfield Housing Authority to convey a certain parcel of land and the buildings to the Oxford Housing Authority. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Brookfield Housing Authority to convey a certain parcel of land and the buildings thereon

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2018
2018-05-17SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-05-16HouseEnacted
2018-05-14HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-02-07HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-02-07HouseRules suspended
2018-02-07HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-01-18HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-01-16SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2018-01-16SenateRules suspended
2018-01-16SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2017-09-14SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2017-09-05JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2017-08-03HouseHouse concurred
2017-07-31SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
2017-07-31SenateRules suspended
2017-06-12SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H3701 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4754
H674 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4754
S746 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2405
H4580 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 197 of the Acts of 2018
H4615 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4802

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback