MA S2142 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to solar power in environmental justice and urban communities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to solar power in environmental justice and urban communities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-02HouseHouse concurred
2022-04-28SenateReporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-01-06JointHearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S2165 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3346 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence
H3291 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S2168 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2174 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback