MA S214 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2666
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure driver privacy with electronic tolling. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To ensure driver privacy with electronic tolling
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2666 |
2021-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1553 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2367 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied S2307
S2258 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2666 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1922 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1756 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2367 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied S2307
S2258 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2666 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1922 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1756 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S214 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S214.pdf |