MA S2126 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2559
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to parking safety. Transportation.
Title
Relative to parking safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2559 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied S2559 |
2019-12-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1130 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1287 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H987 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S766 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
H945 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3752 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4496
S2559 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1287 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H987 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S766 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
H945 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3752 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4496
S2559 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2126 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2126.pdf |