MA S2126 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to correct pension inequity for James G. Clothier. Public Service.
Title
Correcting pension inequity for James G. Clothier
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-07-20 | House | House concurred |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
S1422 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1404 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1496 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2554 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1480 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2574 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2565 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H476 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H22 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2407 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2536
H4402 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4709
S1422 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1404 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1496 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2554 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1480 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H2574 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2565 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H476 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H22 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2407 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2536
H4402 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4709
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2126 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2126.pdf |