MA S2120 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase solar rooftop energy. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Increasing solar rooftop energy
Sponsors
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
Rep. Danillo Sena [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Sen. Lydia Edwards [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2088 (Similar To) 2023-11-07 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H3685 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
S2558 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - House concurred
H3685 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
S2558 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2120 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2120.pdf |