MA S2098 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S669
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand veterans survivor benefits,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2098).
Title
To expand veterans survivor benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-01-28 | Senate | New draft of S669 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S669 (Replaces) 2016-01-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2098
S1905 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
S984 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1423 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1823 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S411 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2171
S1340 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1335 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1905 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
S984 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1423 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1823 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S411 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2171
S1340 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1335 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2098 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2098.pdf |