MA S2085 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 108 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the town of Plymouth to exchange a parcel of land held for conservation purposes for a parcel of land in the town of Plymouth. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the town of Plymouth to exchange a parcel of land held for conservation purposes for a parcel of land in the town of Plymouth

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-26 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #209 [YEAS 37 to NAYS 0] (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 271 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-31 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 108 of the Acts of 2017
2017-10-26SenateLaid before the Governor
2017-10-26SenateEnacted -see Roll Call #209 [YEAS 37 to NAYS 0]
2017-10-25HouseEnacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 271)
2017-10-23SenateSenate concurred in the House amendment
2017-10-23SenateRules suspended
2017-10-16HousePassed to be engrossed
2017-10-16HouseRead third, amended by substitution of a new text (H3959)
2017-08-03HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-08-03HouseRules suspended
2017-08-03HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-07-31HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-07-27SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2017-07-27SenateRules suspended
2017-07-27SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-07-05SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2017-06-21JointHearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 222
2017-06-14HouseHouse concurred
2017-06-12SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H3692 (Similar To) 2017-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 90 of the Acts of 2017
S766 (Similar To) 2017-08-31 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1152 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2017
H1106 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2017
H3712 (Similar To) 2017-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H3717 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3809
S927 (Similar To) 2017-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H3670 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2017
S2102 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3850 (Similar To) 2017-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S926 (Similar To) 2017-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H3959 (Similar To) 2017-10-16 - Text of an amendment, see S2085

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback