MA S927 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2313

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to certain appeals in the Superior Court and the Land Court. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to standing to file certain appeals in the superior or land court

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2313
2017-09-19JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S792 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S1609 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2345 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H940 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S926 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1025 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S250 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H651 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H874 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback