MA S2039 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3695
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-02 - See H3695
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-02 - See H3695
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Non-transferable licenses
Title
Non-transferable licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Joyce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-02 | Senate | See H3695 |
2015-11-02 | Senate | Recommended new text (Joyce) for H3695 |
Same As/Similar To
H3695 (Replaced by) 2016-02-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2016
S2071 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - See H3695
S2173 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2363
H248 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 458 of the Acts of 2016
H3323 (Similar To) 2015-08-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3710
S2031 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - New draft substituted, see S2118
H288 (Similar To) 2015-07-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3660
H1418 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H271 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4180
H3225 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4330
S2071 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - See H3695
S2173 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2363
H248 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 458 of the Acts of 2016
H3323 (Similar To) 2015-08-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3710
S2031 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - New draft substituted, see S2118
H288 (Similar To) 2015-07-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3660
H1418 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H271 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4180
H3225 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4330
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2039 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2039.pdf |