MA H3225 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4330
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide additional funding for school districts experiencing increases in English language learners. Education.
Title
Establishing funds to provide for increases in English language learners in school districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4330 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-04-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, May 6, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4330 (Replaced by) 2016-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H4566
H2501 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1286 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H364 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H2991 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H363 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
H2501 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1286 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H364 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H2991 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H363 (Similar To) 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3225 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3225.pdf |