MA S2033 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-24 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-24 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to sell naming rights to the Boston Convention and Exhibition Center and other properties operated by the MCCA. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To sell naming rights to the Boston Convention and Exhibition Center and other properties operated by the MCCA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-24 | House | House concurred |
2024-07-19 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Tuesday December 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence |
2024-07-19 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-07-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 19, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2033 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2033.pdf |