MA S2033 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S968
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to fairness in worker’s compensation disfigurement benefits (Senate, No. 968) [also based on House, No. 1707],-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2033).
Title
Relative to fairness in worker’s compensation disfigurement benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #193 [YEAS 36 - NAYS 1] |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Read third |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Substituted, as amended, for S968 |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tarr) adopted |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tarr) rejected -see Roll Call #192 [YEAS 9 to NAYS 27] |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, October 22, 2015 |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S968 |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S968 (Replaces) 2015-10-22 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2033
S2106 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S994 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied H1705
S1431 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1430 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S990 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1331 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1021 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1429 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1438 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2046 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1264 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1266 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1267 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1293 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S2106 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S994 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied H1705
S1431 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1430 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S990 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1331 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1021 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1429 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1438 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2046 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1264 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1266 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1267 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1293 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2033 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2033.pdf |