MA S2023 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish Building Trades Recovery Week. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing Building Trades Recovery Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2021-10-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3177 (Similar To) 2022-12-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2023 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2023.pdf |