MA S2021 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to employment of persons with disabilities on state contracts. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to employment of persons with disabilities on state contracts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-09SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2021-06-30JointHearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S1908 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H1984 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1164
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
H4048 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4007
H4097 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4297
H4124 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4622
H1870 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1169 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2697
S1178 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1840 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S122 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1192 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback