MA S1979 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-20 - Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to deeds excise receipts. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to deeds excise receipts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-20JointHearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H2906 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4020 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback