MA S1977 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2287
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-21 - Accompanied a study order, see S2287
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-21 - Accompanied a study order, see S2287
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to Medicaid. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to Medicaid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2287 |
2014-07-09 | House | House concurred |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 31, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-03-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/27/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2014-01-15 | House | House concurred |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Financial Services |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-10-21 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2287 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1977 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1977.pdf |