MA S1972 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the timely and consistent payment of law enforcement personnel. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the timely and consistent payment of law enforcement personnel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2023 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1705 (Similar To) 2023-11-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3001 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3001 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1972 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1972.pdf |