MA S1964 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Miranda, a petition of Liz Miranda for the adoption of resolutions to improve the care of atherosclerotic cardiovascular disease. Senate Rules.
Title
Resolutions to improve the care of atherosclerotic cardiovascular disease
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Miranda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S116 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H2132
S678 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2640
S1952 (Similar To) 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S2640 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S678 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2640
S1952 (Similar To) 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S2640 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1964 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1964.pdf |