MA S1923 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2483
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to standards for protective headgear for operators or passengers on motorcycles. Transportation.
Title
Relative to standards for protective headgear for operators or passengers on motorcycles
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Todd Smola [R] | Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Kevin Kuros [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2483 |
2017-11-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/17 from 3:00PM-5:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied S1380
S1328 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1361 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2477
H1196 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2037 (Similar To) 2017-03-03 - See H68
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1472 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2060 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Again adopted and placed on file
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1437 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2483 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1328 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1361 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2477
H1196 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2037 (Similar To) 2017-03-03 - See H68
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1472 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2060 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Again adopted and placed on file
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1437 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2483 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1923 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1923.pdf |