MA H1196 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4625
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to infectious disease control. Public Health.
Title
Relative to infectious disease control
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Rep. William Crocker [R] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Thomas Calter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4625 |
2017-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied S1380
S2037 (Similar To) 2017-03-03 - See H68
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1472 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2060 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Again adopted and placed on file
H1437 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4625 (Replaced by) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2037 (Similar To) 2017-03-03 - See H68
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1472 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2060 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Again adopted and placed on file
H1437 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4625 (Replaced by) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1196 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1196.pdf |