MA S1910 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a tax credit for teachers purchasing supplies. Revenue.
Title
Establishing a tax credit for teachers purchasing supplies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4560 (Similar To) 2024-07-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4615 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - See H3911
H4920 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4615 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - See H3911
H4920 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1910 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1910.pdf |