MA S1906 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2568
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - New draft substituted, see S2568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - New draft substituted, see S2568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide identification to homeless youth and families. Transportation.
Title
To provide identification to homeless youth and families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2568 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, June 28, 2018 |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2568 |
2017-12-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/06/17 from 1:00PM-3:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1121 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S1315 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1375 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S374 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S170 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4384
H114 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H695 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H188 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4384
H386 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H363 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H4120 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
S2337 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2436
S2568 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1315 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1375 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S374 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S170 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4384
H114 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H695 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H188 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4384
H386 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H363 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H4120 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4597
S2337 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2436
S2568 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1906 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1906.pdf |