MA S189 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4274
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4274
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4274
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ease the burden of medical debt. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To ease the burden of medical debt
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Miranda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4274 |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4274 (Replaced by) 2024-05-28 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H347 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4274
S743 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H1222
H1222 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3564 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4274
H347 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4274
S743 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H1222
H1222 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3564 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4274
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S189 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S189.pdf |