MA S1888 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to notification of landowners impacted by state transportation projects. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to notification of landowners impacted by state transportation projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H1334 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3078 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H2790 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1174 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
H3129 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2184 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1139 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3034 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1246 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H3078 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H2790 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1174 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
H3129 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2184 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1139 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3034 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1246 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1888 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1888.pdf |